skip to content

Akhtar, Nadeem

CPSO#: 92377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of London, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 James St N
Hamilton Family Health Team
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Nov 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019 Active
             Dr. Nadeem Akhtar may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.