skip to content

Akef, Reza

CPSO#: 94883

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
138 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 1A4
Phone: 9055972030 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pain Care Clinic
245 Wycroft Rd
Oakville ON  L6K 3Y6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Reza Akef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Akef ( CPSO# 94883 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1 - 245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3Y6
Phone Number: (289) 817-7246

Business Address:
138 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 1A4
Phone Number: (647) 728-2400

Business Address:
33 Broadway
Suite 1
Orangeville ON  L9W 1J7

Business Address:
Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8


Corporation Name: Dr. Reza Akef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Akef ( CPSO# 94883 )

Business Address:
138 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 1A4
Phone Number: (647) 728-2400

Business Address:
1 - 245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3Y6
Phone Number: (289) 817-7246

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
33 Broadway
Suite 1
Orangeville ON  L9W 1J7

Business Address:
Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REZA AKEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2012