skip to content

Akcakir, Yasemin

CPSO#: 95967

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2013 Lawrence Ave West #5
Toronto ON  M9N 0A3
Phone: 647-581-5007
Fax: 855-274-0007 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5721
Fax: 4166032782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

205 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T2G8
Canada
Phone: 519-758-5800
Fax: 519-758-5801
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000 Ext. 43000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yasemin Akcakir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Akcakir ( CPSO# 95967 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T S8
Phone Number: 416-603-5721

Business Address:
205 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2H2
Phone Number: (519) 758-5800

Business Address:
5 - 2013 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M9N 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 240-7222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASEMIN AKCAKIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKCAKIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2014