skip to content

Akbar, Mohammad A E M

CPSO#: 96946

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2013