skip to content

Ajisebutu, Tewogbola Samuel

CPSO#: 97000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Airport Health Centre
Suite 106
3417 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 1A8
Phone: (905) 677-0658
Fax: (905) 677-0659 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Doctors On Albion
Unit 6
1780 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 1C1
Canada
Phone: (416) 744-0656
Fax: (416) 744-0657
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1980 St. Clair Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M6N 4X9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tewogbola Ajisebutu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ajisebutu ( CPSO# 97000 )

Business Address:
Airport Health Centre
Suite 106
3417 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 677-0658

Business Address:
Suite 6
1780 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 1C1
Phone Number: (416) 744-0656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEWOGBOLA SAMUEL AJISEBUTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJISEBUTU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012