skip to content

Ajayi-Obe, Jacob Oluwagbenga

CPSO#: 85774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sarnia Medical Group
494 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4
Phone: (519) 336-6019
Fax: (519) 336-7136 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.O. Ajayi-Obe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ajayi-Obe ( CPSO# 85774 )

Business Address:
Sarnia Medical Building
494 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACOB OLUWAGBENGA AJAYI-OBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJAYI-OBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007