skip to content

Chanana, Ajay

CPSO#: 119936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King's College London GKT School, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Book appts - www.AjayMedical.ca
697 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M6C 1B2
Phone: (647) 450-2529
Fax: (855) 953-3580 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1168A Dundas St West
Toronto ON  M6J 1X6
Canada
Phone: 647-450-2529
Fax: 855-953-3580
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Oct 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AJAY CHANANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2020