skip to content

Aizenman, Allan Israel

CPSO#: 23682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2318 Georgina Drive
Ottawa ON  K2B 7M5
Phone: (613) 828-4305
Fax: (815) 352-1753 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN ISRAEL AIZENMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIZENMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983