skip to content

Ainslie, William Hugh

CPSO#: 15079

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 14-Dec-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical Records were stored between 2000-2010. The medical records were then shredded.
Date Received: 30 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014