skip to content

Ahsan, Muhammad Rauf

CPSO#: 88665

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Medical Center
Rm C828
1403 - 29 St NW
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-2515
Fax: (403) 944-2906

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rauf Ahsan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:22 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD RAUF AHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 12 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013