skip to content

Ahn, Justin Sulki

CPSO#: 91098

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014