Ahn, Diane Shinyoung (CPSO#: 99709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PCRM Edmonton
300-9888 Jasper Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
Edmonton AB  T5J5C6
Phone: 780-990-4442

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE SHINYOUNG AHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jan 2013 to 03 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 27 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014