skip to content

Ahmed, Zeeshan

CPSO#: 100359

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
McMaster Clinic, Room 511
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZEESHAN AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2017