skip to content

Ahmed, Sherief Mohamed K. M.

CPSO#: 96916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ross University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Rd.
Suite 210
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 844-0311
Fax: (905) 844-0836 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sherief Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 96916 )

Business Address:
Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road
Suite 210
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 844-0311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHERIEF MOHAMED K. M. AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013