skip to content

Ahmed, Shajan

CPSO#: 93759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3131 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Intrepid Health Group
250 Dundas St. West
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga ON  L5B1J2
Canada
Phone: 9052752273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Intrepid Medical Centre & Walk-In
379 Bond St. West
Oshawa ON  L1J 8R7
Canada
Phone: 905-240-4678
Fax: 905-240-7334
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Intrepid Health Group
75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON  L6Y 6H4
Canada
Phone: 289-401-4678
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stouffville Hospital ER
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shajan Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 93759 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Business Address:
250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1J2
Phone Number: (905) 275-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAJAN AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012