skip to content

Ahmed, Sana Ara

CPSO#: 98736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
279 Queen St S
Mississauga ON  L5M 1L9
Phone: 1-800-894-6968
Fax: (844)840-2474 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

220 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 417
Toronto ON  M3B 2V1
Canada
Phone: 1-800-894-6968
Fax: 844-840-2474
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sana-Ara Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 98736 )

Business Address:
279 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1L9
Phone Number: (800) 363-4112


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANA ARA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012