skip to content

Ahmed, Sabera

CPSO#: 84893

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Dhaka, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-3950
Fax: (905) 336-9632 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

140 centinneal pky
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 662-4141
Fax: (905) 662-2362
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sabera Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 84893 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
3rd Floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-3437

Business Address:
140 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Phone Number: (905) 561-9255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SABERA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2008