skip to content

Ahmed, Musawir

CPSO#: 97512

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 23 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 23 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Mar 2018
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2018