skip to content

Ahmed, Itrat Tahira

CPSO#: 85081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-325-2201 Ext. 3597 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


New Brunswick
Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ITRAT TAHIRA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2019