skip to content

Ahmed, Aftab

CPSO#: 26360

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Mar 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Feb 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1974
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2002

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Mar 2002
Summary:

 On March 11, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Ahmed(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct with respect to sexually abusing a patient.  By way of joint 
 submission, the Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Ahmed be reprimanded and the fact 
 of the reprimand be recorded on the register;

2.	the Registrar revoke Dr. Ahmed(s certificate of 
 registration, such revocation to take effect immediately;

3.	Dr. Ahmed pay to the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the (College() the costs of this hearing fixed in the sum of $ 
 2,500.00, and that the costs are payable forthwith; and

4.	Dr. Ahmed reimburse the College for 
 funding paid by the College to the patient named the Notice of Hearing, for therapy and counseling 
 pursuant to the provision of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the 
 Regulated Health Profession Act, 1991.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 11, 2002