Ahmadi Torshizi, Ali (CPSO#: 99787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: (647) 344-5028
Fax: (647) 3489206
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

305- 9600 Bathurst St.
Vaughan ON  L6A3Z8
Canada
Phone: (647) 3445028
Fax: (647)3489206
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M0B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Ahmadi Torshizi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ahmadi Torshizi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmadi Torshizi ( CPSO# 99787 )

Business Address:
Unit 210
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (647) 344-5028

Business Address:
Suite 305
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (647) 344-5028

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 29 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI AHMADI TORSHIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMADI TORSHIZI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013