skip to content

Ahmad, Yusra Naifa

CPSO#: 94494

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Yonge St. Medical Centre
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M4Y 1X9
Phone: 647-620-8831
Fax: 416-920-4163 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yusra Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ahmad ( CPSO# 94494 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
Suite 308
500 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1X9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YUSRA NAIFA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
EL - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013