skip to content

Ahmad, Semina

CPSO#: 97110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 8
51 Mountain Ash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-1000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEMINA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2016