skip to content

Ahmad, Fuad

CPSO#: 96577

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Med Walk-In Clinic
9200 Weston Rd
Unit 24
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2P8
Phone: 905-553-0393
Fax: 905-266-1056 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Durham Doctors House Call Service
104 James Govan Drive
Whitby ON  L1N 0J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 619-6641
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. F. Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ahmad ( CPSO# 96577 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Med Walk-In Clinic
24-9200 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2P8
Phone Number: (905) 553-0393


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FUAD AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012