skip to content

Ahmad, Afzal

CPSO#: 25309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Oct 1972
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
611 Holly Ave
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: 905 875 2900 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

102-71 King St W
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Canada
Phone: 905 897 1144
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Afzal Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmad ( CPSO# 25309 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 279-1144

Business Address:
Suite 104
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2

Business Address:
Level 4
1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 741-5661

Business Address:
Suite 106
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AFZAL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1972