skip to content

Ahluwalia, Ravjit Singh

CPSO#: 90939

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Street Medical Centre
10886 Hurontario Street North
Suite 9
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ravjit Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 90939 )

Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Suite 9
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAVJIT SINGH AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011