skip to content

Ahimbisibwe, Asa

CPSO#: 85568

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mbarara University of Science & Technolo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HESPELER MEDICAL CLINIC
B12-350 Conestoga Blvd,
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: 519-629-3388
Fax: 519-629-4630 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: 519-740-4938
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Uganda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASA AHIMBISIBWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHIMBISIBWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2012 to 14 Feb 2013
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018