skip to content

Ah Now, Walter

CPSO#: 21299

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
15 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Walter Ah Now Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 2021