skip to content

Agulefo, Nwafor Theodoric Chukwulobe

CPSO#: 24919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jul 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:Dalhousie University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2008