skip to content

Agostino, Kevin David

CPSO#: 98150

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 766-7300 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kevin Agostino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Agostino ( CPSO# 98150 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3266

Business Address:
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone Number: (807) 285-1894

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVIN DAVID AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2021 to 29 Aug 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014