First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Oct 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2023 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2024 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2024 |