skip to content

Aggett, Paul Winton

CPSO#: 17063

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Jan-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.