skip to content

Aggarwal, Anita

CPSO#: 84838

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Dec 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gulbarga University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 84838 )

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Medicine
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010 Active
             Dr.  Anita  Aggarwal  may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.