skip to content

Agarushi, Rula Essam

CPSO#: 91580

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014