skip to content

Zafar, Aftab

CPSO#: 71241

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sutie 201
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 1L3
Phone: (519) 954-5900
Fax: (519) 954-5339 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zafar ( CPSO# 71241 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 1L3
Phone Number: (519) 954-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:13 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AFTAB ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004