skip to content

Afshar, Maryam

CPSO#: 97087

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ankara, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Credit Valley Hospital, 100 Queensway West, Missisauga, ON L5B 1B8
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016