skip to content

Afridi, Sajida Parveen

CPSO#: 93493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Centre St S
Oshawa ON  L1H 4B2
Phone: 905-721-4747
Fax: 905-723-8139 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

580 Harwood Avenue S.
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: 905-623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

300 Gordon St
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Canada
Phone: 9056686831
Fax: 9057238139
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

10419 102 AVE NW
Edmonton AB  T5J 0B4
Canada
Phone: 7804293991
Fax: 7804293998
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sajida Afridi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 27 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Afridi ( CPSO# 93493 )

Business Address:
300 Centre St S
Oshawa ON  L1H 4B2
Phone Number: 9057214747

Business Address:
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: 9056832320

Business Address:
HOSPITAL CT
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: 9055768711

Business Address:
10419 102 Ave NW
Edmonton AB  T5J 0B4
Phone Number: 7804293991

Business Address:
47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: 9056233331

Business Address:
300 Gordon St
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: 9056686831


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAJIDA PARVEEN AFRIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFRIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2019