skip to content

Advent, Donald Anthony

CPSO#: 31482

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald A. Advent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Paul Howard, Suite 301, 1 Quarry Ridge Road, Barrie, ON L4M 7G1 Tel: (705) 725-0885
Date Received: 19 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1977 to 15 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019