skip to content

Adrian Gutierrez, Javier

CPSO#: 93865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Salamanca, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundas Medical Centre
Suite 306
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-9001
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Javier Adrian Gutierrez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adrian Gutierrez ( CPSO# 93865 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 306
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 665-9001


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Spain

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:22 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020 Active
             Dr. Javier Adrian Gutierrez may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.