Adnan, Shazia Aziz (CPSO#: 100462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: 905-829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shazia Aziz Adnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Adnan ( CPSO# 100462)

Business Address:
2513 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAZIA AZIZ ADNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2016