skip to content

Adler, Reva Nan

CPSO#: 96528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-7671 Alderbridge Way
Phone: 6046753649

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reva N. Adler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adler ( CPSO# 96528 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:29 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REVA NAN ADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011