skip to content

Naidu, Adithi

CPSO#: 108260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical Clinic
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga, ON, L5N 8E1
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone: 905 785 3627
Fax: 905 785 3628 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

225 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B6J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-7743
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adithi Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naidu ( CPSO# 108260)

Business Address:
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Business Address:
Enhanced Care Center
3857 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 354-2640

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADITHI NAIDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Dec 2015 to 24 Dec 2015
EL - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016