skip to content

Adie, Mohammad Amin

CPSO#: 88237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170-250 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8X 2R3
Phone: 5199461110
Fax: 5199153143 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. A. Adie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adie ( CPSO# 88237 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Division of Neonatology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 255-6741

Business Address:
4588 Lange Grnade Court
Windsor ON  N9G 2R3
Phone Number: (519) 915-8557

Business Address:
Suite 101
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 946-1110


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Michigan
USA - North Dakota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AMIN ADIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010