skip to content

Adekoya, David Adekunle

CPSO#: 86082

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

13158 Tecumseh Rd East
Unit 4
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

380 Pelissier St
Unit 109
Windsor ON  N9A 6W8
Canada
Phone: 519 254 0008
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Adekoya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Adekoya ( CPSO# 86082 )

Business Address:
13185 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6

Business Address:
60 Park Street West
Windsor ON  N9A 7A8
Phone Number: (519) 254-0008

Business Address:
WRH Metropolitan Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ADEKUNLE ADEKOYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEKOYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011