skip to content

Adegboyega-Conde, Omotola Ibitayo Laura

CPSO#: 96281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4800
Fax: (905) 845-6419 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Omotola Adegboyega-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Adegboyega-Conde ( CPSO# 96281 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMOTOLA IBITAYO LAURA ADEGBOYEGA-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEGBOYEGA-CONDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013