skip to content

Rabiu, Adegbenga Oluwaseun

CPSO#: 107501

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rabiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rabiu ( CPSO# 107501)

Business Address:
Southbank Medical Centre
Unit 1
2046 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (289) 501-2016

Business Address:
Green Street Medical Centre
16 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3R2
Phone Number: (289) 501-2046

Business Address:
O'Connor Medical Group
Suite 403
367 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 Jan 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 Jul 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Apr 2020
Summary:

The College alleged that Dr. Rabiu engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, Ms. A, during an April 2018 
 appointment for her child, including by inappropriate and/or sexual touching of Ms. A’s 
body, including her breasts, and by lifting or displacing her clothing without consent. 
 
The College also alleged that Dr Rabiu had committed an act of professional 
misconduct in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
registration. 
 
On December 16 and 17, 2019, and January 15, 2020, the Discipline Committee 
heard submissions and testimony from the parties and witnesses, and 
reserved its decision.  
 
On April 8, 2020, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rabiu engaged in 
disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct by: (1) conducting an 
examination of Ms. A without proper communication and in a manner that 
made her uncomfortable; (2) examining Ms. A and writing a prescription for her 
in contravention of a term, condition, or limitation on his certificate of 
registration. 
    
The Committee found that Dr. Rabiu did contravene a limitation on his 
certificate of registration by treating an adult patient despite the fact that his 
practice was limited to pediatrics, and that this contravention is an act of 
professional misconduct.  
 
The Committee found that the allegation of sexual abuse is not proven. 
 
On June 30, 2020, following a penalty hearing, the Committee issued its Order 
on penalty and costs, which included an order that Dr. Rabiu attend for a 
reprimand, have a four month suspension of his certificate of registration, have 
certain terms, conditions and limitations placed on his certificate of 
registration, and pay costs to the College in the amount of $29,036.00. 
 
The full text of the Committee’s April 2020 decision is available on the 
College’s website. The full penalty decision was released on July 29, 2020 and 
the combined decision is available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16-18, 2019 and Jan 15, 2020 Penalty Hearing: June 30, 2020