Adebowale, Akinade Oluseyi (CPSO#: 99704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
8000 Commissioners Road E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 0A8
Canada
Phone: 7057593434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Akinade Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adebowale ( CPSO# 99704 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKINADE OLUSEYI ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2014