skip to content

Adamson, Peter Allan

CPSO#: 25872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ethiopia
Nepal
Russian Federation
Rwanda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER ALLAN ADAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981