skip to content

Adamson, Margaret Elaine Mcmillan

CPSO#: 29020

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 19 Nov 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Apr 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adamson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking access to a copy of their record can contact RSRS: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 2019