skip to content

Adams, Jeremy William

CPSO#: 88766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 32720
Fax: 905-521-6068 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 389-4411
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines, ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-978-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeremy Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 88766 )
Dr. L. Erdman ( CPSO# 103637)

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 978-4647

Business Address:
St. Josepsh's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton St.
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: 905-522-1155

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 935-4763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEREMY WILLIAM ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012